Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4593.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|