California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1757 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2016

Amended

Bill May 5, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016