California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 14, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015