California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1764 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2016

Amended

Bill May 3, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016