California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1770 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016