California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1773 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016