LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1775
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1775
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1775
Compare Versions
AB1775 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB1775 Enrolled August 17, 2016
AB1775 Amended April 13, 2016
AB1775 Amended March 18, 2016
AB1775 Introduced February 3, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1775 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB1775 Enrolled August 17, 2016
AB1775 Amended April 13, 2016
AB1775 Amended March 18, 2016
AB1775 Introduced February 3, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare