Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4462.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|