Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2016 | Read first time. To print. |