Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | Read first time. To print. |