California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1783 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016