California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1784 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 16, 2016
Bill March 3, 2016