California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1785 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 3, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016