California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1787 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016