California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1789 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016