Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3979.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|