Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2016 | Read first time. To print. |