Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5007.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4943.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|