LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1807
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1807
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1807
Compare Versions
AB1807 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB1807 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1807 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1807 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1807 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1807 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1807 Amended May 27, 2016
AB1807 Amended April 18, 2016
AB1807 Amended April 4, 2016
AB1807 Introduced February 8, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1807 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB1807 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1807 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1807 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1807 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1807 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1807 Amended May 27, 2016
AB1807 Amended April 18, 2016
AB1807 Amended April 4, 2016
AB1807 Introduced February 8, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare