LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB181
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB181
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB181
Compare Versions
AB181 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB181 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB181 Amended September 4, 2015
AB181 Amended August 31, 2015
AB181 Amended June 29, 2015
AB181 Amended April 23, 2015
AB181 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB181 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB181 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB181 Amended September 4, 2015
AB181 Amended August 31, 2015
AB181 Amended June 29, 2015
AB181 Amended April 23, 2015
AB181 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare