|
07/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4650.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4361.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|