California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1816 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill May 24, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016