Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 25. Page 4906.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4852.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4448.) In committee: Reconsideration granted by unanimous consent. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 5.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|