California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016