07/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/25/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 4656.). | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4719.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2016 | Read first time. To print. |