Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2016 | Read first time. To print. |