|
09/28/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4962.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4869.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|