California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1838 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016