California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1841 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016