California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1842 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016