California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1845 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016