California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1847 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill April 7, 2016
Bill March 8, 2016