Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|