California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1850 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2016

Amended

Bill May 2, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016