Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 11). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2016 | Read first time. To print. |