LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1856
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1856
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1856
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 10, 2016
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
July 7, 2016
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
July 25, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 6, 2016
Compare
Bill
March 29, 2016
Compare
Bill
March 17, 2016
Compare