California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1858 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016