LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1859
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1859
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1859
Compare Versions
AB1859 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB1859 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1859 Amended August 18, 2016
AB1859 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1859 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1859 Amended June 14, 2016
AB1859 Amended April 18, 2016
AB1859 Amended March 18, 2016
AB1859 Introduced February 10, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1859 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB1859 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1859 Amended August 18, 2016
AB1859 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1859 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1859 Amended June 14, 2016
AB1859 Amended April 18, 2016
AB1859 Amended March 18, 2016
AB1859 Introduced February 10, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare