|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 610, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6289.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5250.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 5092.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|