California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1864 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016