08/17/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2016. | |||
08/17/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/05/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4728.). | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4260.) | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2016 | Read first time. To print. |