Senate | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5025.) | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2016 | Read first time. To print. |