Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2016 | Read first time. To print. |