Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2015 | Read first time. To print. |