Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4684.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|