Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4952.) | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2016 | Read first time. To print. |