California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB189 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill August 25, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015