California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1890 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016