Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5120.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5143.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|