Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5244.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|